This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/01/2019 at 11:33:48 (UTC).

Estate of Paul Mireles, Jr., deceased

Case Summary

On 09/30/2011 Estate of Paul Mireles, Jr , deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0590

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Fanucchi, Jackie

Mireles, Linda

Decedent

Mireles, Paul Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Manassero, George

 

Court Documents

First and Final Account, Petition

06/27/2012: First and Final Account, Petition

Order

07/27/2012: Order

Distributee Receipt

Distributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Tentative Rulings

07/25/2012: Tentative Rulings

Distributee Receipt

Distributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE147 Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt

09/30/2011: DE147 Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt

DE150 Letters

10/31/2011: DE150 Letters

DE111A Petition for Probate and Letters of Administration

09/30/2011: DE111A Petition for Probate and Letters of Administration

Probate Notes

07/18/2012: Probate Notes

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEx Parte Petition for Final Discharge and Order filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDistributee Receipt filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/31/2012
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
71 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketStatus of Linda Mireles updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketStatus of Linda Mireles updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketStatus of Linda Mireles updated to Active/Represented. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketProof of Publication filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 10/31/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 32 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketAdvice to Heirs filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2011
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Mireles, Linda; Fanucchi, Jackie on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manassero, George