This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 07:44:54 (UTC).

Estate of Matthew J Nielsen

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Estate of Matthew J Nielsen was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0173

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Decedent

Nielsen, Matthew J

Not Classified By Court

Nielsen, Jamie N

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Final Distribution held on 10/24/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Waiver of Accounting by Heir

Waiver of Accounting by Heir filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Waiver of Account; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE160 Inventory and Appraisal

Inventory and Appraisal filed in the amount of $348,000.00 Action Type: Inventory and Appraisal DE-160/GC-040; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE150 Letters

Letters filed and issued. Action Type: Letters Issued; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE140 Order for Probate

Order Appointing Personal Representative filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Appointment of Personal Representative held on 04/18/2016 01:51 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

decree of distribution

Decree of Distribution entered and filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

proposed order

10/06/2016: proposed order

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Waiver of Bond

Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary DE-142/DE-111 (A-3d); Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE121 Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate Decedents Estates)

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Letters

02/23/2016: Proposed Letters

Proposed Order

02/23/2016: Proposed Order

DE111A Petition for Probate and Letters of Administration

Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Decree of Distribution entered and filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • Hearing re: Final Distribution held on October 24, 2016. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Final Distribution held on 10/24/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Notice of Hearing - Decedent's Estate or Trust DE-120; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • First and Final Report of Administrator filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Petition on Waiver on Account; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Accounting by Heir filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Waiver of Account; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • Payment received by AAA Legal Document Assistant in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 93430. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Proposed Action filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Notice of Proposed Action DE-165; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Publication filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Waiver of Bond by Heir or Beneficiary DE-142/DE-111 (A-3d); Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Appointment of Personal Representative , set for 04/18/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33928. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration filed by Nielsen, Jamie N. Action Type: Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less