This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/22/2019 at 06:28:34 (UTC).

Estate of Marie Marguelone Willard

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Estate of Marie Marguelone Willard was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holland, Lesley D. and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0177

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holland, Lesley D.

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Decedent

Willard, Marie Marguelone

Not Classified By Court

Marraccini, Lisa A

Interested Parties

Department of Health Care Services

San Joaquin County Public Conservator

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Rosa, Randall W

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2016
  • FILE: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FILE: Withdrawal of Request for Special Notice filed by Department of Health Care Services. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • FILE: Dismissal of Creditor's Claim filed by Department of Health Care Services. Action Type: Miscellaneous Filing; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • FILE: Creditor's Claim filed by San Joaquin County Public Conservator. Action Type: Creditor's Claim; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • PRI&A: Inventory and Appraisal filed in the amount of $ Action Type: Inventory and Appraisal; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • FILE: Waiver of Account filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Waiver of Account; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2016
  • POSF: Proof of service by mailing filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • FILE: Last Will and Testament filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Last Will and Testament; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • MINUTES: Minutes finalized for Appointment of Personal Representative held on 04/27/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • HH: Hearing re: Appointment of Personal Representative held on April 27, 2016. Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 02/29/2016
  • FILE: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • FILE: Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Advice to Heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • FILE: Request for Special Notice filed by Department of Health Care Services. Action Type: Request for Special Notice; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • FILE: Creditor's Claim filed by Department of Health Care Services. Action Type: Creditor's Claim; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • ACCTPMT: Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34204. Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • ATTORNEY RETAINED: Attorney, Randall W Rosa, retained for Lisa A Marraccini . Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • CI: Case initiated. Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • FILE: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • FILE: Petition for Probate of Will - Letters Testamentary filed by Marraccini, Lisa A. Action Type: Petition for Probate of Will - Letters Testamentary; Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • SHSET: Hearing regarding: Appointment of Personal Representative , set for 04/27/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Lesley D. Holland.

    Read MoreRead Less