This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/18/2018 at 07:45:10 (UTC).

Estate of Janis Dean Bailey

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Estate of Janis Dean Bailey was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************0176

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bailey, Leland

Decedent

Bailey, Janis Dean

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Hastings, Charles L.

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 09/26/2016 08:30 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE226 Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order (Probate-Decedents Estates)

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order filed by Leland Bailey. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Declaration

Declaration of Leland Bailey in support of Spousal Property Petition filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed order

09/20/2016: Proposed order

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 08/01/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 06/08/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 04/20/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Order

03/16/2016: Proposed Order

DE120 Notice of Hearing Decedents Estate or Trust (Probate Decedents Estates)

Notice of Hearing filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE221 Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition

Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition DE-221; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Order filed by Leland Bailey. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Hearing re: Spousal Property Petition held on September 26, 2016. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 09/26/2016 08:30 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • Payment received in the amount of $25.00, receipt number 104486. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Leland Bailey in support of Spousal Property Petition filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Spousal Property Petition , set for 09/26/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 08/01/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Spousal Property Petition held on 04/20/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2016
  • Hearing Result: Continued - Parties Motion Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Probate Note published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Hearing filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Notice of Hearing; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Spousal Property Petition , set for 04/20/2016 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 31. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition filed by Bailey, Leland. Action Type: Spousal or Domestic Partner Property Petition DE-221; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Charles L. Hastings, retained for Leland Bailey . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 34191. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less