This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/05/2019 at 11:02:02 (UTC).

Estate of Evangeline Ave, Deceased

Case Summary

On 04/01/2010 Estate of Evangeline Ave, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0174

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ave, Evangeline

Not Classified By Court

Dunlap, William T Iii

Others

Manzanares, Cheryl

Gifford, Kathie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

Smith, Andrew D

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

04/01/2010: Payment Receipt

Probate Notes

04/30/2010: Probate Notes

Probate Notes

04/30/2010: Probate Notes

Tentative Rulings

05/07/2010: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

05/10/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

05/17/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

06/07/2011: Payment Receipt

Probate Notes

06/30/2011: Probate Notes

Tentative Rulings

07/06/2011: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

07/08/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

03/26/2015: Notice of Case Reassignment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to 31 effective 03/26/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketDisposition for Gifford Kathie ,Manzanares Cheryl ,Ave Evangeline on Petition - Other (subsequent petition) updated to Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (subsequent petition) associated on 07/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketCase closed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketPetition - Other (subsequent petition) has been Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2011
  • DocketOrder Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed by Gifford, Kathie; Manzanares, Cheryl on 07/07/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2011
  • DocketVolume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketAddress for Andrew Smith selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 05/10/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 31 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketAdvice to Heirs filed by Gifford, Kathie; Manzanares, Cheryl on 04/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2010
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Gifford, Kathie; Manzanares, Cheryl on 04/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 04/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 149 - First papers others in the amount of 355.00 on 04/01/2010, transaction number 506044 and receipt number 119829. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Gifford, Kathie; Manzanares, Cheryl on 04/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Gifford, Kathie; Manzanares, Cheryl on 04/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Smith, Andrew D