This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/05/2019 at 10:45:15 (UTC).

Estate of Edward W. Hunt, Deceased

Case Summary

On 02/19/2010 Estate of Edward W Hunt, Deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0092

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Administrator

Hunt, Justin R

Decedent

Hunt, Edward W

Not Classified By Court

Erreca, Bob

Department Of Health Care Services, Estate Recovery Branch

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Patridge, John J

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

02/19/2010: Payment Receipt

Receipt for Deposited Will

02/19/2010: Receipt for Deposited Will

Receipt for Deposited Will

02/23/2010: Receipt for Deposited Will

Probate Notes

03/24/2010: Probate Notes

Tentative Rulings

03/26/2010: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

03/29/2010: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

07/19/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

11/23/2010: Payment Receipt

Probate Notes

12/21/2010: Probate Notes

Tentative Rulings

12/23/2010: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

12/29/2010: Minute Order

Probate Notes

01/06/2011: Probate Notes

Tentative Rulings

01/11/2011: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

01/12/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

06/11/2015: Notice of Case Reassignment

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to 31 effective 06/11/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2011
  • DocketDismissal of Creditor's Claim (and withdrawal of request for special notice) filed by Department of Health Care Services on 02/08/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Vitek, Laura to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketAssociation created between Patridge, John J and Hunt, Justin R. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketPetition on Final Account associated on 01/18/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2011
  • DocketOrder Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed by Hunt, Justin R on 01/12/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketVolume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2010
  • DocketPetition For Probate Of Will And For Letters Of Administration With Will Annexed, With A.T.A. - scheduled for 03/29/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 14 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 02/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 143 - First petition for letters of admin or letters testamentary. in the amount of 355.00 on 02/19/2010, transaction number 481556 and receipt number 112518. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate updated 02/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act updated 02/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Hunt, Justin R on 02/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Administration with Will Annexed with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Hunt, Justin R on 02/19/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH CARE SERVICES is a litigant