This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/05/2019 at 12:28:11 (UTC).

Estate of Edward John Hohe, deceased

Case Summary

On 09/22/2010 Estate of Edward John Hohe, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0557

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court

American Infosource

Lacativo, Neal A.

Decedent

Hohe, Edward John

Other

Fehling, John

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorney

Manassero, George

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

10/29/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

08/29/2011: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

09/06/2011: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

10/28/2010: Tentative Rulings

Payment Receipt

09/28/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

08/22/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Case Reassignment

03/26/2015: Notice of Case Reassignment

Probate Notes

09/16/2011: Probate Notes

Payment Receipt

09/27/2010: Payment Receipt

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to 31 effective 03/26/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2015
  • DocketCase initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2012
  • DocketOrder for Final Discharge (by ExParte Petition) filed by Fehling, John on 06/29/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketOrder Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution (Signed by Edward Hohe) associated on 06/28/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketReceipt of Distribution (Signed by Elizabeth Hohe) filed by Fehling, John on 06/26/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketReceipt of Distribution (Signed by Edward Hohe) filed by Fehling, John on 06/26/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Probate to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution (First and final) associated on 09/30/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Elizabeth Hohe) filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (Declaration of Edward Hohe) filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketProof of Subscribing Witness filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 10/29/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 32 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketWill Deposit filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketAdvice to Heirs filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Fehling, John on 09/22/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN INFOSOURCE AS AGENT FOR BANK OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manassero, George