This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/05/2019 at 12:30:46 (UTC).

Estate of Dorothy Leora Zunino, deceased

Case Summary

On 09/29/2010 Estate of Dorothy Leora Zunino, deceased was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0581

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Decedent

Zunino, Dorothy Leora

Administrator

Zunino, John B.

Not Classified By Court

Lacativo, Neal A.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

11/01/2010: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

10/29/2010: Tentative Rulings

Probate Notes

11/08/2010: Probate Notes

Minute Order

10/03/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

10/31/2011: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/04/2010: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

10/21/2011: Payment Receipt

Tentative Rulings

11/22/2010: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

11/15/2010: Minute Order

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketDisposition for Zunino John B.,Zunino Dorothy Leora on Petition for Final Distribution updated to Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution associated on 11/02/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketCase closed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketPetition for Final Distribution has been Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2011
  • DocketOrder Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed by Zunino, John B. on 10/31/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2011
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
115 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketAddress for F. William Dorband selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketAssociation created between F. William Dorband and John Zunino. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketCase initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 09/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 143 - First petition for letters of admin or letters testamentary. in the amount of 355.00 on 10/04/2010, transaction number 618286 and receipt number 152886. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with A.T.A. - scheduled for 11/01/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 32 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2010
  • DocketPetition for Letters of Administration with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Zunino, John B. on 09/29/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less