Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/14/2018 at 10:58:32 (UTC).

Estate of Arthur L McKeown

Case Summary

On 10/16/2017 Estate of Arthur L McKeown was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holland, Lesley D.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1113

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holland, Lesley D.

 

Party Details

Decedent

McKeown, Arthur L

Not Classified By Court

McKeown, James

Discover Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Weltman, Scott

 

Court Documents

DE174 Allowance Or Rejection of Creditors Claim (Probate-Decedents Estates)

Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim DE-174; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE160 Inventory and Appraisal

Inventory and Appraisal filed in the amount of $585,081.31 Action Type: Inventory and Appraisal DE-160/GC-040; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

bond

Bond filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Bond; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE150 Letters

Letters filed and issued. Action Type: Letters Issued; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Appointment of Personal Representative held on 12/06/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE140 Order for Probate

Order Appointing Personal Representative filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE172 Creditors Claim

Creditor's Claim filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Creditor's Claim DE-172; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proposed Letters

11/20/2017: Proposed Letters

Proposed Order

11/20/2017: Proposed Order

DE147 Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McKeown, James. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Declaration

Declaration filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Proof of Publication

Proof of Publication filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Proof of Publication; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE121 Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate Decedents Estates)

Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE172 Creditors Claim

Creditor's Claim filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Creditor's Claim DE-172; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

DE111A Petition for Probate and Letters of Administration

Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $54.00, receipt number 281955. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Inventory and Appraisal filed in the amount of $585,081.31 Action Type: Inventory and Appraisal DE-160/GC-040; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Allowance or Rejection of Creditor's Claim DE-174; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letters filed and issued. Action Type: Letters Issued; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Bond filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Bond; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Personal Representative filed. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • Hearing re: Appointment of Personal Representative held on December 6, 2017. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Appointment of Personal Representative held on 12/06/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Creditor's Claim DE-172; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Duties and Liabilities of Personal Representative and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by McKeown, James. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Notice of Petition to Administer Estate DE-121; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • Attorney, Scott Weltman, retained for Discover Bank . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Creditor's Claim filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Creditor's Claim DE-172; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Appointment of Personal Representative , set for 12/06/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Lesley D. Holland in Department 11A. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration filed by McKeown, James. Action Type: Petition for Probate - Letters of Administration; Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • Payment received by James McKeown in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 221735. Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weltman, Scott