This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/01/2019 at 09:41:05 (UTC).

Estate Lillie M. Holloman, Decedent

Case Summary

On 01/14/2011 Estate Lillie M Holloman, Decedent was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0027

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Others

Dixon, Linda Jean

Chatman, Cynthia

Decedent

Holloman, Lillie M

Not Classified By Court

Erreca, Bob

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

10/17/2012: Payment Receipt

DE121 Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate Decedents Estates)

01/14/2011: DE121 Notice of Petition to Administer Estate (Probate Decedents Estates)

Minute Order

06/29/2011: Minute Order

Minute Order

07/20/2011: Minute Order

Judgment

07/20/2011: Judgment

Advice to heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons

02/15/2011: Advice to heirs, Devisees and Interested Persons

Minute Order

02/23/2011: Minute Order

DE140 Order for Probate

02/23/2011: DE140 Order for Probate

Tentative Rulings

06/28/2011: Tentative Rulings

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/26/2015
  • DocketCase reassigned to 31 effective 03/26/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2015
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 to Offsite,Records Management Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketPayment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side), 141J - Certifying a copy, paper or record in the amount of 27.50 on 10/17/2012, transaction number 1068308 and receipt number 284074. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Staff,Almendarez, Cecilia to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Rm 303 Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketDisposition for Chatman Cynthia ,Dixon Linda Jean,Holloman Lillie m on Amended Petition updated to Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketAmended Petition associated on 07/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketCase note created on 07/21/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketCase closed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketAmended Petition has been Granted. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2011
  • DocketOrder Settling Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution filed by Chatman, Cynthia; Dixon, Linda Jean on 07/20/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 01/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 180 - First papers others in the amount of 395.00 on 01/19/2011, transaction number 717923 and receipt number 188843. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketA Will and/or Codicil was offered and a receipt was generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketSan Joaquin Case Label generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will, Letters Testamentary with A.T.A. - scheduled for 02/23/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 32 at Stockton. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 32. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketNotice of Petition to Administer Estate filed by Chatman, Cynthia; Dixon, Linda Jean on 01/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketDuties and Liabilities of Personal Representative filed by Chatman, Cynthia; Dixon, Linda Jean on 01/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2011
  • DocketPetition for Probate of Will and Letters Testamentary with Authorization to Administer Under the Independent Administration of Estates Act filed by Chatman, Cynthia; Dixon, Linda Jean on 01/14/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less