This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 17:14:28 (UTC).

Ernestine Bowen et al. vs Brent Critchfield

Case Summary

On 08/08/2016 Ernestine Bowen filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brent Critchfield. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kronlund, Barbara and Humphreys, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7902

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kronlund, Barbara

Humphreys, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Holder, Orentia

Bowen, Ernestine

Defendant

Critchfield, Brent

Arbitrator

Walker, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nwosu, Geoffrey C.

Defendant Attorney

Rolfe, Randee

 

Court Documents

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to Ernestine Bowen, Orentia Holder, Brent Critchfield, David Walker Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator

Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator. Action Type: Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Order

Order Granting Stipulation to Appointment of Non-Binding Arbitrator filed by Brent Critchfield; signed by Judge Humphreys Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Stipulation

Stipulation to Appointment of Non-Binding Arbitrator filed by Critchfield, Brent. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Nomination of Arbitrators

Notice of Nomination of Arbitrators. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/10/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Critchfield, Brent. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EH)

Elizabeth Humphreys Assigned. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

Answer

Answer to Unverified Complaint filed by Critchfield, Brent. Action Type: First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice - Entire Action as to Ernestine Bowen, Orentia Holder, Brent Critchfield, David Walker Entered. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator. Action Type: Notice of Appointment of Arbitrator; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Stipulation to Appointment of Non-Binding Arbitrator filed by Brent Critchfield; signed by Judge Humphreys Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation to Appointment of Non-Binding Arbitrator filed by Critchfield, Brent. Action Type: Stipulation; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Nomination of Arbitrators. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/10/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on February 10, 2017. Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Humphreys, Elizabeth.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2016
  • Payment received by Brent Critchfield in the amount of $585.00. Receipt number 97669. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/10/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 42. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Payment received by Holder, Orentia in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 88211. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Holder, Orentia; Bowen, Ernestine. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Attorney, Geoffrey C. Nwosu, retained for Orentia Holder . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2016
  • Attorney, Geoffrey C. Nwosu, retained for Ernestine Bowen . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rolfe, Randee