This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:57:25 (UTC).

Erika Windorski vs Matthew Windorski

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 Erika Windorski filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Matthew Windorski. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0961

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Windorski, Erika

Respondent

Windorski, Matthew

Not Classified By Court

Troop - 2016, Shelly

Other

The University of California Retirement Savings Program

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Norton, Michael

Respondent Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Long Cause Trial Re Property Issues and Spousal Support, set for 09/24/2018 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Trial Setting held on June 13, 2018. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Trial Setting held on 06/13/2018 09:30 AM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Erika Windorski, Matthew Windorski Entered. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting , set for 06/13/2018 at 9:30 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department 5A. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Settlement Conference held on May 9, 2018. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 05/09/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Mediation held on April 26, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Mediation held on 04/26/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Mediation held on April 6, 2018. Judge: Jacobs, Nan.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketProof of service by mail filed by Windorski, Matthew. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA) filed by Windorski, Matthew. Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement (UUCJEA); Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • DocketResponse and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Windorski, Matthew. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Matthew Windorski filed. Served on 03/04/2016. Method of Service: Personal Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketPayment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 35165. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketAttorney, April M Meyer, retained for Erika Windorski . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Windorski, Erika . Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Windorski, Erika. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM - UC 457B PLAN is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiessen, Lisa