This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 12:01:09 (UTC).

Erica Uwaka vs Graciella Costa

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 Erica Uwaka filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Graciella Costa. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8373

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Uwaka, Erica

Respondent

Costa, Graciella

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits, Depositions and/or Administrative Records

Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Ruling on Submitted Matter filed by Erica Uwaka, Graciella Costa.

Order After Hearing

Ruling on Submitted Matter filed by Erica Uwaka, Graciella Costa.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 10/12/2021 09:30 AM .

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 10/01/2021 10:30 AM .

CH120 Response to Request for Civil Harassment Restraining Orders

Response filed by Costa, Graciella along with POS.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for OSC Re: Harassment held on 10/07/2021 09:30 AM .

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail.

Order to Destroy Exhibits, Depositions and/or Administrative Records

03/02/2022: Order to Destroy Exhibits, Depositions and/or Administrative Records

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • DocketEvidence presented at trial destroyed pursuant to CCP 1952.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service by Mail.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Ruling on Submitted Matter; Court Room: M2; Result: Vacated; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ruling on Submitted Matter held on 10/14/2021 10:00 AM .; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRuling on Submitted Matter filed by Erica Uwaka, Graciella Costa.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Harassment; Court Room: M2; Result: Held; Judge: Tony J. Agbayani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Ruling on Submitted Matter , set for 10/29/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOSC Re: Harassment scheduled on 10/01/2021 at 10:30 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse filed by Costa, Graciella along with POS.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) as to Graciella Costa and mother Amy Costa served on 09/21/2021 by Personal Service. $0.00.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: OSC Re: Harassment , set for 10/01/2021 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department M2.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/07/2021.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Erica Uwaka, Graciella Costa.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Restraining Order Notice to Filing Party.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Orders to Stop Harassment with Violence (Civil Harassment) filed by Uwaka, Erica.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Uwaka, Erica.; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J.

    Read MoreRead Less