Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/18/2018 at 02:43:00 (UTC).

Emily Wallace vs David Wallace

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 Emily Wallace filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against David Wallace. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4381

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wallace, Emily

Respondent

Wallace, David

Not Classified By Court

Cabero - 2017, Cheryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Ellis, Albert M

Respondent Attorney

Thiessen, Lisa

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Emily Wallace, David Wallace Entered. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • Proof of Personal Service filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Proof of Personal Service; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2017
  • Payment received by Albert Ellis in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 196491. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Attorney, Albert M Ellis, retained for Emily Wallace . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr.'s RFO child custody, visitation, child support, spousal support, attorney's fees and costs, set for 09/22/2017 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Declaration of Albert Ellis in Support of Request for Attorney's Fees filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • RFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Wallace, Emily. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Wallace, Emily. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ellis, Albert M