This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/20/2022 at 12:03:17 (UTC).

Todd Hatcher et al. vs Rosalie Gwerder et al.

Case Summary

On 09/16/2021 Todd Hatcher filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Rosalie Gwerder. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8788

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Gwerder, Nicholas

Gwerder, Rosalie

Guardian Ad Litems and Cross Defendants

Hatcher, Todd

Hatcher, Angelica

Hatcher, Austin

Hatcher, Emily Rose

Minors

Hatcher, Emily

Hatcher, Austin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Minor Attorney

Lalezary, Shervin

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sutherland, James B.

Cross Defendant Attorney

Bonotto, Phillip R. Esq.

Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

Walker-Dupler, Timothy C.

Shastaty, Esq., Joseph

 

Court Documents

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 03/14/2022 08:30 AM .

Proposed Order

03/10/2022: Proposed Order

Motion

Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Hatcher, Emily; Hatcher, Todd.

Notice to Filing Party

03/10/2022: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

03/08/2022: Notice to Filing Party

Notice to Filing Party

03/08/2022: Notice to Filing Party

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hatcher, Emily; Hatcher, Todd.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Gwerder, Rosalie; Gwerder, Nicholas.

Answer

Answer to Complaint filed by Gwerder, Rosalie; Gwerder, Nicholas.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Jury Trial Assignment time estimate: seven days, set for 04/24/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 03/20/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion for Order held on 07/28/2022 08:45 AM .

Order

Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed.

Non-Opposition

Non-Opposition to Motion for Preference filed by Hatcher, Angelica; Hatcher, Emily Rose; Hatcher, Todd; Hatcher, Austin.

Answer

Answer to Cross-Complaint for Indemnity; Declaratory Relief and Apportionment of Fault filed by Hatcher, Austin; Hatcher, Todd; Hatcher, Emily Rose; Hatcher, Angelica.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion for Order held on 07/14/2022 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Motion for Preference

Reply

Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preference filed by Hatcher, Emily; Hatcher, Austin.

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial Assignment; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Mandatory Settlement Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: CMC: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial Estimate 7 days, set for 04/24/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Mandatory Settlement Conference , set for 03/20/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion for Order; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Angelica Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Angelica Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem); Austin Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Austin Hatcher (Minor); Emily Hatcher (Minor); Emily Rose Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Nicholas Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Nicholas Gwerder (Defendant); Rosalie Gwerder (Cross-Complainant); Rosalie Gwerder (Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Cross-Defendant); Todd Hatcher (Guardian Ad Litem)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Timothy C. Walker-Dupler, retained for Todd Hatcher .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem of Minor filed by Emily Hatcher.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 03/14/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Hatcher, Emily.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hatcher, Emily.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Emily Hatcher in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 680598.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Shervin Lalezary, retained for Emily Hatcher .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BONOTTO, PHILLIP R