This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:37:53 (UTC).

Elvira B Ochoa vs Rodolfo Ochoa Guillen

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Elvira B Ochoa filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Rodolfo Ochoa Guillen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0888

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ochoa, Elvira B

Respondent

Guillen, Rodolfo Ochoa

Not Classified By Court

Troop - 2016, Shelly

Interested Party

County of San Joaquin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Smith, Julie

Respondent Attorneys

Coston, Corrine R

Coston, Corinne R

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Guillen, Rodolfo Ochoa. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Guillen, Rodolfo Ochoa. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Guillen, Rodolfo Ochoa. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on April 4, 2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 04/04/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • hearing continued by Golden Rod Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Proof of service filed by Guillen, Rodolfo Ochoa. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
32 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2016
  • RFO-Request for Order filed by Ochoa, Elvira B. Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 34248. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 34248. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Julie Smith, retained for Elvira B Ochoa . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Ochoa, Elvira B. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Ochoa, Elvira B. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Ochoa, Elvira B. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less