This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 10:22:53 (UTC).

Elva Fonseca vs Rosa Elia Garibay et al.

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 Elva Fonseca filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Rosa Elia Garibay. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Manteca Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************8212

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Fonseca, Elva

Defendants

Gomez, Miguel Angel

Garibay, Rosa Elia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Osgood, Warren

 

Court Documents

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Rosa Elia Garibay served on 07/13/2018 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Miguel Angel Gomez. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Writ Return

Writ of Possession as to Rosa Elia Garibay and Miguel Angel Gomez served on 08/22/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Miguel Angel Gomez served on 07/13/2018 by Substituted Service. $45.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Order and Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits, Depositions and/or Administrative Records

03/12/2019: Order and Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits, Depositions and/or Administrative Records

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Denied as to Miguel Angel Gomez. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

Request to Set/Counter Request to Set for Trial filed by Fonseca, Elva. Action Type: Request to Set/Counter Request to Set for Trial; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

03/12/2019: Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • Writ of Execution issued as to Rosa Elia Garibay and Miguel Angel Gomez on 02/05/2019 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • Payment received by Elva Fonseca in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 384610. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 338604. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession as to Rosa Elia Garibay and Miguel Angel Gomez served on 08/22/2018 by Returned With Full Satisfaction. $145.00. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Writ of Possession issued as to Rosa Elia Garibay and Miguel Angel Gomez on 08/10/2018 to San Joaquin County. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Payment received by Law Office of Warren Osgood in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 323475. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment after court trial entered and filed. Total judgment amount $2,718.10. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by Fonseca, Elva. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Judgment for Elva Fonseca against Rosa Elia Garibay, Miguel Angel Gomez in the amount of 0.00 past due rent, 2333.10 hold over damages, 0.00 attorney fees and, 385.00 costs. Possession of the premises located at 1414 French Camp Road, Manteca, CA 95336. . Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Garibay, Rosa Elia. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Payment received in the amount of $1.00, receipt number 313684. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Attorney, Warren Osgood, retained for Elva Fonseca. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by Fonseca, Elva. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Fonseca, Elva. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Payment received by Warren Osgood in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 311235. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less