This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:27:32 (UTC).

Elliott Owen Aldrich vs Ashlee Lynn Aldrich

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Elliott Owen Aldrich filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ashlee Lynn Aldrich. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0840

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Aldrich, Elliott Owen

Respondent

Aldrich, Ashlee Lynn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sonnenberg, Ranette Aileen

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2017
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record filed by Aldrich, Ashlee Lynn. Action Type: Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Hearing re: Settlement Conference held on December 27, 2016. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference held on 12/27/2016 08:30 AM . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Declaration of Jennifer A. Coenenberg Regarding Fees filed by Aldrich, Ashlee Lynn. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Resp's RFO Spousal Support, Attorney Fees and Costs, set for 05/10/2016 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Cheryl A. McCann in Department F3. Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • Proof of service filed by Aldrich, Ashlee Lynn. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Notice and Acknowledgement of Receipt; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Community and Quasi Community Property Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Aldrich, Elliott Owen. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33729. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Elliott Owen Aldrich . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less