This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/25/2020 at 05:58:46 (UTC).

Ellanah Hayes vs Macy's, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Ellanah Hayes filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Macy's, Inc. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4298

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hayes, Ellanah

Defendants

Macy's, Inc.

Federated Department Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kronlund, Michael C

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Federated Department Stores, Inc. served on 06/11/2020 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/23/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Further Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Ellanah Hayes (Plaintiff); Participant: Federated Department Stores, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Macy's, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participant: Ellanah Hayes (Plaintiff); Participant: Federated Department Stores, Inc. (Defendant); Participant: Macy's, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/19/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/23/2020 08:30 AM . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on November 23, 2020. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Federated Department Stores, Inc. served on 06/11/2020 by Personal Service. $40.00. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/23/2020 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Hayes, Ellanah. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketPayment received by Ellanah Hayes in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 561589. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Michael C Kronlund, retained for Ellanah Hayes . Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Lee, Jayne.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less