This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/27/2020 at 11:36:20 (UTC).

Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson vs Todd Marvin Anderson

Case Summary

On 08/22/2018 Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Todd Marvin Anderson. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4532

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Anderson-Barraza, Elizabeth

Barraza-Anderson, Elizabeth

Respondent

Anderson, Todd Marvin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Niemeyer, Jennifer A

Thomas, Randy E

Respondent Attorneys

Norton, Michael

Coenenberg, Jennifer A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 5A; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robin Appel; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: OSC Re: Contempt; Court Room: 5A; Result: Dropped; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • DocketCorrected 2nd Amended Restraining Order After Hearing Granted. Expires on 08/18/2020. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing Granted. Expires on 08/18/2020. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • HearingHearing Type: Court Trial; Court Room: 5A; Result: Vacated; Judge: Cheryl A. McCann; Participant: Todd Marvin Anderson (Respondent); Participant: Elizabeth Barraza-Anderson (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
138 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Sheriff (Fee Waived) returned Unserved as to Todd Marvin Anderson. Costs $35.00 Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Domestic Violence Restraining Order TRO (Elizabeth Barraza Anderson), set for 09/25/2018 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Tony J. Agbayani in Department 4B. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing - TRO filed by Elizabeth Anderson-Barraza. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order Granted and filed on 09/04/2018. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Ex Parte Application. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketRequest for Domestic Violence Restraining Order filed by Anderson-Barraza, Elizabeth. Action Type: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Elizabeth Anderson-Barraza in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 327684. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketPetition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Anderson-Barraza, Elizabeth. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.