This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/30/2019 at 01:06:24 (UTC).

Elda A Prieto vs Cruz Arana

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 Elda A Prieto filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Cruz Arana. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Agbayani, Tony J.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************5237

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Agbayani, Tony J.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Prieto, Elda A

Respondent

Arana, Cruz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Declaration and Order to Set Aside Judge: McCann, Cheryl A..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Declaration and Order to set aside Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Prieto, Elda A Not Entered. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Request for Default against Cruz Arana Entered Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Request to Enter Default - Family Law filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Request to Enter Default - Family Law; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Corrected Proof of Service of Summons filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Proof of Service of Amended Summons(Family Law) as to Cruz Arana served on 01/16/2019 by Personal Service. $0.00. Judge: Agbayani, Tony J..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Payment received in the amount of $3.00, receipt number 377373. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Amended Petition filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Amended Petition; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Cruz Arana filed. Served on 10/03/2018. Method of Service: Personal Service Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Elda A Prieto. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Petition for Legal Separation filed by Prieto, Elda A. Action Type: Petition for Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less