This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/13/2018 at 13:57:44 (UTC).

Efrain Alvarado vs Maria Guadalupe Cornejo Ramirez 200000002071561

Case Summary

On 02/02/2017 Efrain Alvarado filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Maria Guadalupe Cornejo Ramirez 200000002071561. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Appel, Robin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0561

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Appel, Robin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Alvarado, Efrain

Respondent

Cornejo Ramirez, Maria Guadalupe

Not Classified By Court

Braten - 2016, Earl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dorn, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address filed by Cornejo Ramirez, Maria Guadalupe. Action Type: Notice of Change of Address; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • Findings and Orders After Hearing as to Efrain Alvarado, Maria Guadalupe Cornejo Ramirez Entered. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Case associated with case: , STA-FL-FSC-2018-0002804 Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Mediation , set for 08/16/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Minutes finalized for Request for Order-Modification held on 05/08/2018 08:15 AM . Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on May 8, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Hearing re: Request for Order-Modification held on May 8, 2018. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Income and Expense Declaration filed by Alvarado, Efrain. Action Type: Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee) filed by Alvarado, Efrain. Action Type: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order (No Fee); Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • Supplemental Declaration of Efrain Alvarado in Support of Request for Modification of Child Custody and Visitation Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 02/02/2017
  • Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application filed by Alvarado, Efrain. Action Type: Declaration re: Notice of Ex Parte Application; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Temporary Emergency (Ex Parte) Orders as to Efrain Alvarado Granted and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time Granted and filed on 02/02/2017. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Payment received by Jessica Dorn in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 139366. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Attorney, Jessica Dorn, retained for Efrain Alvarado . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • RFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted submitted by Alvarado, Efrain. Action Type: RFO Request for Order with Temporary Orders and/or Order Shortening Time-Submitted; Judge: Appel, Robin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act filed by Alvarado, Efrain . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Alvarado, Efrain. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dorn, Jessica