This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 16:07:07 (UTC).

Edgar Mora vs Jose Martinez et al.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2021 Edgar Mora filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Jose Martinez. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0946

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mora, Edgar

Defendants

Martinez, Jose

Olega, Joselito

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Werbin, Anthony

Defendant Attorney

Leonard, Bruce E

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mora, Edgar.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mora, Edgar.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Jose Martinez served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $209.15.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Joselito Olega served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $121.65.

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/26/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.

Proof of Personal Service_170279.pdf

Proof of Service of Summons as to Joselito Olega served on 03/19/2022 by Personal Service. $129.15.

Answer

Answer First Paper Unlimited Civil (amount over $25,000) filed by Olega, Joselito. Defendant Jocelito Olega (erroneously sued as Joselito Olega)

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial filed by Olega, Joselito.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Olega, Joselito.

CM-110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Mora, Edgar.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/26/2022 08:45 AM .

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Jury Trial; Court Room: 10D; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Edgar Mora (Plaintiff); Jose Martinez (Defendant); Joselito Olega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Held; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Edgar Mora (Plaintiff); Jose Martinez (Defendant); Joselito Olega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Jury Trial assignment, set for 09/05/2023 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on July 26, 2022.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 07/26/2022 08:45 AM .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Mora, Edgar.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Olega, Joselito.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Reset - Court's Motion; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Edgar Mora (Plaintiff); Jose Martinez (Defendant); Joselito Olega (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Bruce E Leonard, retained for Joselito Olega .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial filed by Olega, Joselito.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Joselito Olega served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $121.65.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Jose Martinez served on 03/16/2022 by Substituted Service. $209.15.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 06/01/2022 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Mora, Edgar.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Mora, Edgar.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Edgar Mora in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 699574.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Werbin, retained for Edgar Mora .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Leonard, Bruce E