Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 00:17:47 (UTC).

Duane B. Oxford-Baker vs Bryan Mills

Case Summary

On 05/25/2018 Duane B Oxford-Baker filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Bryan Mills. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************6192

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oxford-Baker, Duane B.

Defendant

Mills, Bryan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moore, Roger A

 

Court Documents

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/25/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/19/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: McNatt, Bob.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Oxford-Baker, Duane B.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oxford-Baker, Duane B.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2019
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 10/17/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • Hearing re: CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on June 25, 2019. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for CMC: Further Case Management Conference held on 06/25/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 06/25/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on February 19, 2019. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/19/2019 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2018 08:45 AM . Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/19/2019 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on November 21, 2018. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/21/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Bob McNatt in Department 11B. Judge: McNatt, Bob.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/21/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000) filed by Oxford-Baker, Duane B.. Action Type: Complaint Limited ($10,000 up to $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Attorney, Roger A Moore, retained for Duane B. Oxford-Baker . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oxford-Baker, Duane B.. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Payment received by Duane Oxford-Baker in the amount of $370.00. Receipt number 297046. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Moore, Roger A