This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/20/2018 at 09:23:39 (UTC).

Donna Pirro vs. Elizabeth Barreas

Case Summary

On 01/16/2015 Donna Pirro filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Elizabeth Barreas. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0465

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pirro, Donna

Defendants

Barreas, Elizabeth

Nupta, Sash

Guiterrez, Jessie

 

Court Documents

Notice to Filing Party

01/27/2015: Notice to Filing Party

Notice that you have been sued

01/16/2015: Notice that you have been sued

Payment Receipt

02/05/2015: Payment Receipt

Payment Receipt

01/16/2015: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

04/02/2015

Complaint associated on 04/02/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2015

Writ has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2015

The status of Award1 has been updated to Fully Satisfied. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/02/2015

Writ of Possession Returned filed by Pirro, Donna on 02/20/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/22/2015

Case security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2015

Milestone of Disposition 45 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2015

Milestone of Disposition 30 days met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2015

Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2015

Automatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2015

Complaint disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
01/16/2015

Address for Donna Pirro selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Volume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 01/16/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Case has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Case assigned to Department M2. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Original Summons filed by Pirro, Donna on 01/16/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Pirro, Donna on 01/16/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/16/2015

Complaint filed by Pirro, Donna on 01/16/2015. Judge: CONVERSION.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less