This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 02/28/2022 at 08:03:53 (UTC).

Donald Tracy Liggett vs Amanda Marie Fultz

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Donald Tracy Liggett filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against Amanda Marie Fultz. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0382

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Liggett, Donald Tracy

Respondent

Fultz, Amanda Marie

Not Classified By Court

Braten - 2016, Earl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Dorn, Jessica

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketNotice of Completion of Limited Scope Representation filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: Notice of Completion of Limited Scope Representation; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • Docket(Proposed) Notice of Completion of Limited Scope Representation filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: Notice of Completion of Limited Scope Representation; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Donald Tracy Liggett, Amanda Marie Fultz Entered.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketFindings and Orders After Hearing as to Donald Tracy Liggett, Amanda Marie Fultz Entered.; Judge: McCann, Cheryl A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Request for Order-Initial; Court Room: 4A; Result: Held; Judge: Robin Appel; Participants; Amanda Marie Fultz (Respondent); Donald Tracy Liggett (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration of Petitioner In Support of Requested Child Custody and Child Visitation Order filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketNotice of Limited Scope Represenation filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: Notice of Limited Scope Represenation; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Request for Order-Initial held on 04/20/2021 08:15 AM .; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Request for Order-Initial held on April 20, 2021.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Jessica Dorn, retained for Donald Tracy Liggett .; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jursidiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) GC-120 filed by Fultz, Amanda Marie.; Action Type: Declaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jursidiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) GC-120; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Fultz, Amanda Marie.; Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketResponsive Declaration to Request for Order filed by Fultz, Amanda Marie.; Action Type: Responsive Declaration to Request for Order; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Request for Order-Initial Petr's RFO custody, visitation, set for 03/10/2021 at 8:15 AM before Hon. Robin Appel in Department 4A.; Judge: Appel, Robin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketRFO-Request for Order (Initial) filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: RFO-Request for Order (Initial); Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Jurisdiction and Enforcement Act (UCCJEA) filed by .; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPetition for Custody and Support of Minor Children filed by Liggett, Donald Tracy.; Action Type: Petition for Custody and Support of Minor Children; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketPayment received by Donald Liggett in the amount of $495.00. Receipt number 618519.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Unassigned,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dorn, Jessica