This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/20/2018 at 10:27:16 (UTC).

Donald D Smallie vs Sandra J Smallie

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Donald D Smallie filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Sandra J Smallie. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Family Law Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0838

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Family Law Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Smallie, Donald D

Respondent

Smallie, Sandra J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2016
  • Family Law Judgment entered and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure filed by Smallie, Donald D. Action Type: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation filed by Smallie, Donald D. Action Type: Declaration for Default or Uncontested Dissolution or Legal Separation; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee filed by Smallie, Donald D. Action Type: Appearance, Stipulations, and Waiver-No Fee; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Smallie, Donald D. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration filed by Smallie, Sandra J. Action Type: Declaration Regarding Service of Declaration of Disclosure and Income and Expense Declaration; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof of service filed by Smallie, Sandra J. Action Type: Proof of Service by Mail; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity filed by Smallie, Sandra J. Action Type: Response and Request for Disso/Legal/Nulity; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 37462. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Summons issued and filed. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Pro Per, retained for Donald D Smallie . Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 33701. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Petition for Dissolution of Marriage filed by Smallie, Donald D. Action Type: Petition for Dissolution of Marriage; Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Unassigned.

    Read MoreRead Less