Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/19/2020 at 02:43:39 (UTC).

DLSA LLC vs Johnny Chaquies

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 DLSA LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Johnny Chaquies. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2062

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DLSA LLC

Defendant

Chaquies, Johnny

Other

All Other Occupants

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rowe, Anthony Drew

 

Court Documents

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Clerk's Default Judgment for Possession for DLSA LLC against Johnny Chaquies, All Other Occupants filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Declaration for Issuance of Writ of Possession pursuant to CCP 712.010

Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Johnny Chaquies served on 02/13/2020 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 02/13/2020. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Johnny Chaquies, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

Complaint

Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

NoticethatYouHaveBeenSued.rtf

Notice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

UnlawfulDetainerNoticetoFilingParty.rtf

Unlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketPayment received by DLSA LLC in the amount of $40.00. Receipt number 542275. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Default Judgment for Possession for DLSA LLC against Johnny Chaquies, All Other Occupants filed and entered Judgment applies to all occupants. See judgment filed herein. . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010 filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Declaration for Writ of Possession CCP 712.010; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of as to All Other Occupants served on 02/13/2020. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Johnny Chaquies served on 02/13/2020 by Personal Service. $55.00. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Judgment filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Johnny Chaquies, All Other Occupants Entered Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Unlawful Detainer; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000) filed by DLSA LLC. Action Type: Complaint Limited Unlawful Detainer (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketPayment received by DLSA LLC in the amount of $240.00. Receipt number 533107. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketAttorney, Anthony Drew Rowe, retained for DLSA LLC . Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Notice to Filing Party. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice That You Have Been Sued. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rowe, Anthony Drew