This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 12:17:48 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs. Sukhwinder Singh

Case Summary

On 12/01/2010 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Sukhwinder Singh. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************9855

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Singh, Sukhwinder

 

Court Documents

Complaint for Money (1-3)

12/01/2010: Complaint for Money (1-3)

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/01/2010: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

SUM100 Summons - Civil

12/01/2010: SUM100 Summons - Civil

Affidavit of Venue

12/01/2010: Affidavit of Venue

Payment Receipt

12/02/2010: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

12/02/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Declaration of Mailing

12/22/2010: Declaration of Mailing

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

12/22/2010: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

Proof of Service of Summons

12/22/2010: Proof of Service of Summons

Declaration of Mailing

12/28/2010: Declaration of Mailing

Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

12/28/2010: Declaration of Reasonable Diligence

Amended Proof of Service of Summons

12/28/2010: Amended Proof of Service of Summons

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

11/14/2011: CIV110 Request for Dismissal

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 18 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketComplaint disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketCase disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketStatus of Discover Bank updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketStatus of Sukhwinder Singh updated to Dismissed without Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Rule 3.740 Collections Failure to File Default Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketComplaint associated on 11/18/2011. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2011
  • DocketCase dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Limited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketAddress for Mark Walsh selected. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketPayment received for 170 - Complaint or other 1st paper <=$10K in the amount of 225.00 on 12/02/2010, transaction number 666347 and receipt number 169748. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 12/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Discover Bank on 12/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank on 12/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2010
  • DocketComplaint filed by Discover Bank on 12/01/2010. Judge: CONVERSION,.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant