This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:48:42 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Parmesh Singh

Case Summary

On 02/24/2016 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Parmesh Singh. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1928

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Singh, Parmesh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hoffmann, Martin

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MC012 Memorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $58.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $2202.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Discover Bank. - ENTERED Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Parmesh Singh served on 03/26/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $64.50. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Discover Bank against Parmesh Singh in the amount of $5,881.32 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Parmesh Singh Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment $58.00, Acknowledgment of Credit $2202.00, and Declaration of Accrued Interest $0.00 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Memorandum of Costs After Judgment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2016
  • Abstract of Judgment Issued. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2016
  • Payment received by Zwicker & Associates PC in the amount of $25.00. Receipt number 113421. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Discover Bank against Parmesh Singh in the amount of $5,881.32 Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Parmesh Singh Entered Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal Does filed by Discover Bank. - ENTERED Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Default clerk's Judgment filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Parmesh Singh served on 03/26/2016. Type of Service Substituted service. $64.50. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34731. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2016
  • Attorney, Martin Hoffmann, retained for Discover Bank . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less