This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/19/2023 at 10:09:26 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Omar Lara

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Omar Lara. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0600

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Lara, Omar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lee, Sunny

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.

Statement

Statement of Venue Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 395(b) filed by Discover Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Omar Lara served on 02/09/2023 by Personal Service. $71.00.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Omar Lara Entered

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Discover Bank.

Declaration in Support

Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Discover Bank.

Declaration

Declaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed by Discover Bank.

Declaration

Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Discover Bank.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Discover Bank against Omar Lara in the amount of 5693.14.

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023

DocketCase status updated to Disposed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketJudgment for Discover Bank against Omar Lara in the amount of 5693.14.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration of Non-Military Service filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketDeclaration Pursuant to CCP 1033 filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Default against Omar Lara Entered; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/08/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Court Judgment filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/14/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Omar Lara served on 02/09/2023 by Personal Service. $71.00.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketStatement of Venue Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 395(b) filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Discover Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806429.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Sunny Lee, retained for Discover Bank .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less