This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 11/22/2023 at 16:10:59 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Laura Araiza

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Laura Araiza. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0609

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Araiza, Laura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gramajo, Andrew J

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Laura Araiza served on 02/05/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.

MC040 Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Discover Bank.

 

Docket Entries

08/24/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Clerk's Judgment filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Laura Araiza served on 02/05/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Discover Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806453.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Andrew J Gramajo, retained for Discover Bank .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

[+] Read More [-] Read Less