This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:47:11 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Juan A Modesto

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Juan A Modesto. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1910

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Modesto, Juan A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Layman, Patrick James

 

Court Documents

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Juan A Modesto Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Non-Military Status

Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration

Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Holly, Carter.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Discover Bank against Juan A Modesto in the amount of $3523.38. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Holly, Carter.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan A Modesto served on 03/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2016
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment for Discover Bank against Juan A Modesto in the amount of $3523.38. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Default against Juan A Modesto Entered Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration in Support of Calculation of Accrued Interest; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • Request for Entry of Default and Clerk's Judgment filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non-Military Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Non-Military Service; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Pursuant to CCP. 1033 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Juan A Modesto served on 03/12/2016. Type of Service Personal. $69.50. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Patrick James Layman, retained for Discover Bank . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34609. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less