This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/19/2018 at 07:47:01 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Drew J Dicob

Case Summary

On 02/23/2016 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Drew J Dicob. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts , Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1908

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Dicob, Drew J

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Layman, Patrick James

 

Court Documents

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration of Venue

Declaration of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration Non Service

Declaration Non-Service Fee$ 69.50 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

declaration of non service

Declaration of Unsuccessful Service filed by Discover Bank. $69.50 Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Discover Bank, Drew J Dicob Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Discover Bank, Drew J Dicob Entered. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Request for Dismissal filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Unsuccessful Service filed by Discover Bank. $69.50 Action Type: Affidavit of Unsuccessful Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration Non-Service Fee$ 69.50 filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Non Service filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Payment received by in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 34605. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Venue filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration of Venue; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • Attorney, Patrick James Layman, retained for Discover Bank . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less