This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 05/14/2020 at 05:39:29 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Cyndy H Nguyen

Case Summary

On 09/18/2019 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cyndy H Nguyen. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mulvihill, Michael. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2312

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mulvihill, Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Nguyen, Cyndy H

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gokoffski, Andrew

 

Court Documents

JUD100 Judgment

Judgment for Discover Bank against Cyndy H Nguyen in the amount of 2314.48. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Notice

Notice of Intention of Incur Court Costs and Legal Fees by Filing Suit Pursuant to C.C.P. section 1033 (b)(2) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal Does filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

Request for Default against Cyndy H Nguyen Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Declaration

Declaration of mailing filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Cyndy H Nguyen served on 10/22/2019 by Substituted Service. $64.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2020
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment for Discover Bank against Cyndy H Nguyen in the amount of 2314.48. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Intention of Incur Court Costs and Legal Fees by Filing Suit Pursuant to C.C.P. section 1033 (b)(2) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal Does filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Dismissal Does; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Clerk Judgment filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Request for Entry of Default and Default Judgment; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Default against Cyndy H Nguyen Entered Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of mailing filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Cyndy H Nguyen served on 10/22/2019 by Substituted Service. $64.50. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketPayment received by Discover Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 474461. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketAttorney, Andrew Gokoffski, retained for Discover Bank . Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Mulvihill, Michael.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.