This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/03/2023 at 17:04:07 (UTC).

Discover Bank vs Cecille A Pascua

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Discover Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Cecille A Pascua. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0610

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Discover Bank

Defendant

Pascua, Cecille A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallace, Douglas S.

 

Court Documents

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Cecille A Pascua served on 02/13/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Discover Bank.

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.

Clerk's Certificate of Service by Mail

(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.

 

Docket Entries

09/18/2023

DocketRequest for Entry of Default and Default Clerk Judgment filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/03/2023
View Court Documents

Docket(Corrected) Notice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/02/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/15/2023
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Cecille A Pascua served on 02/13/2023 by Personal Service. $68.50.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Discover Bank.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketPayment received by Discover Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 806460.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketAttorney, Douglas S. Wallace, retained for Discover Bank .; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Case Assignment.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

[+] Read More [-] Read Less