This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/18/2018 at 00:20:23 (UTC).

Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking et al. vs Bulk Transportation et al.

Case Summary

On 07/28/2017 Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Bulk Transportation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Holly, Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7902

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Holly, Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Bulk Transportation

Cross Defendants

Aschwanden Trucking

Aschwanden, Dirk

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Goodwin, Gregory J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Ferrruzzo, Gregory J.

 

Court Documents

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Dirk Aschwanden in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Reply to Opposition

Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents Set One filed by Bulk Transportation. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Order

Order on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Bulk Transportation. Judge: Holly, Carter.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Gregory J. Goodwin in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Opposition

Defendant Bulk Transportation's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas to Alvarez Hay, New World Tillage and Superior Tank Lines; Declaration of Frank Cutter in Support Thereof filed by Bulk Transportation. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Holly, Carter.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation & Order to Amend Answer to Complaint entered and filed. - signed by Judge Holly - FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ATTACHED Judge: Holly, Carter.

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation & Order to Amend Answer to Complaint entered and filed. - signed by Judge Holly - FIRST AMENDED ANSWER ATTACHED Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Bulk Transportation in the amount of $20.00. Receipt number 309225. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Dirk Aschwanden in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Gregory J. Goodwin in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Declaration in Support; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Motion and Motion to Quash Subpoena; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Gregory J. Goodwin and; Declaration of Dirk Aschwanden filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketPayment received by individually Dirk Aschwanden in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 308167. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion to Quash Pltf's Motion to Quash Subpoena, set for 07/31/2018 at 9:00 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoenas filed by Bulk Transportation. Action Type: Notice of Ruling; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Bulk Transportation. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Compelling Responses to Request of Production of Documents, Set One filed by Bulk Transportation. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory J. Ferrruzzo, retained for Bulk Transportation . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Bulk Transportation served on 09/29/2017 by Electronic Service. . **Served by Email only, no other form of service** Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 01/24/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketAttorney, Gregory J. Goodwin, retained for Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketPayment received by individually Dirk Aschwanden in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 194058. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dirk Aschwanden, individually and dba Aschwanden Trucking. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less