This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/30/2018 at 19:07:24 (UTC).

Dianna Stern vs. County of San Joaquin

Case Summary

On 07/16/2012 Dianna Stern filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against County of San Joaquin. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************8646

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stern, Dianna

Defendants

County of San Joaquin

Doe 1

Miscellaneous Participant 1,

Miscellaneous Participant 100

Doe 4

Miscellaneous Participant 102,

Miscellaneous Participant 101

Mitchell, William J

Miscellaneous Participant 3,

Doe 2

Cohen, Kenneth

Doe 3

Miscellaneous Participant,

Spirit Heating & Air, Inc.

 

Court Documents

Tentative Rulings

10/09/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

07/18/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

10/16/2013: Minute Order

Tentative Rulings

03/25/2013: Tentative Rulings

Tentative Rulings

10/09/2013: Tentative Rulings

Minute Order

03/29/2013: Minute Order

Minute Order

08/01/2013: Minute Order

Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

08/27/2013: Notice Reassignment Judicial San Joaquin

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

07/16/2012: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketOrder Granting associated on 10/01/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketOrder Granting associated on 10/01/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by County of San Joaquin; Cohen, Kenneth; Mitchell, William J on 09/26/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2014
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by County of San Joaquin; Cohen, Kenneth; Mitchell, William J on 09/26/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketAutomatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other associated on 09/17/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketEx Parte Application - Other (of non availability of official court reporting services in civil departments in RE: Ex parte application for order amending orders NUNC PRO TUNC.) associated on 09/17/2014. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketManual Sanction Clock expired. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketMatter heard. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2014
  • DocketVolume updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
359 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketAutomatic Unlimited Case Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketCase Management Conference - scheduled for 12/17/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Stern, Dianna on 07/16/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Stern, Dianna on 07/16/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2012
  • DocketComplaint filed by Stern, Dianna on 07/16/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spirit Heating & Air, Inc. is a litigant