This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 01:08:50 (UTC).

Diana Chamberlain vs. Donald A Betts

Case Summary

On 12/23/2010 Diana Chamberlain filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Donald A Betts. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1006

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chamberlain, Diana

Defendants

Betts, Donald A

Brantley Masonry

Rand, Ingersoll

Brantley, Randall

Cross Defendant

Ingersoll Rand Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Agbulos, Markus A

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

06/26/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

04/27/2012: Minute Order

Minute Order

01/13/2012: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

09/16/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

09/15/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

07/18/2011: Payment Receipt

Minute Order

05/23/2011: Minute Order

Payment Receipt

02/16/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

12/23/2010: Notice of Case Assignment Scheduling Information and Notice of Hearing

Payment Receipt

12/23/2010: Payment Receipt

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 24 months met timely. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 18 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2012
  • Milestone of Disposition 12 months met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Cross-Complaint associated on 11/09/2012. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Cross-Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Status of Randall Brantley updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Status of Ingersoll Rand Co. updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Status of Donald Betts updated to Dismissed with Prejudice. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2012
  • Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
196 More Docket Entries
  • 12/23/2010
  • Automatic Event Scheduled - Not Heard Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Automatic Review Case for Referral to Mediation started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Case Management Conference - scheduled for 05/23/2011 at 08:30:00 AM in 13 at Stockton Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Holland, Lesley. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Original Summons filed by Chamberlain, Diana on 12/23/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chamberlain, Diana on 12/23/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2010
  • Complaint filed by Chamberlain, Diana on 12/23/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brantley Masonry is a litigant

Latest cases where Ingersoll Rand Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Agbulos, Markus A