This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 01:27:03 (UTC).

Diana Carrillo vs. Cathy Hamilton

Case Summary

On 08/01/2011 Diana Carrillo filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Cathy Hamilton. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************0853

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carrillo, Diana

Defendant

Hamilton, Cathy

 

Court Documents

EJ130 Writ of Execution

10/05/2011: EJ130 Writ of Execution

Payment Receipt

08/16/2011: Payment Receipt

UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

09/20/2011: UD110 Judgment- Unlawful Detainer

Order Striking Defendant's Answer

08/16/2011: Order Striking Defendant's Answer

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

08/10/2011: POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

UD105 Answer

08/09/2011: UD105 Answer

CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

08/10/2011: CIV100 Request for Entry of Default or Default Judgment

MC030 Declaration

09/13/2011: MC030 Declaration

Minute Order

09/06/2011: Minute Order

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2012
  • Docketlocation changed from Courthouse to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DocketWrit has been updated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2011
  • DocketCase security level updated to 1 effective . Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketPayment received for 141I - Writ in the amount of 25.00 on 09/21/2011, transaction number 866438 and receipt number 231446. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketMilestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2011
  • DocketWrit issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketStatus of Diana Carrillo updated to Disposed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketAutomatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Cases Awaiting Final Judgment Papers Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketAddress for Diana Carrillo selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCause of Action number 1 added. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketAutomatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketAutomatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketSummons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Carrillo, Diana on 08/01/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Carrillo, Diana on 08/01/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Carrillo, Diana on 08/01/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less