This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 09/17/2023 at 10:06:16 (UTC).

Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC vs Zurich American Insurance Company et al.

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Zurich American Insurance Company. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee, Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1137

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Lee, Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541

Everest Indemnity Insurance Company

General Security Indemnity Company

HDI Global Specialty SE

Indian Harbor Insurance Company

Lexington Insurance Company

Old Republic Union Insurance Company

QBE Specialty Insurance Company

Safety Specialty Insurance Company

Steadfast Insurance Company

United Specialty Insurance Company

Zurich American Insurance Company

Westport Insurance Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hirsch, Bridget Byrnes

Defendant Attorney

Dubbs, Melissa A

 

Court Documents

Order

Order on Verified Application of Luma S. Al-Shibib for Admission Pro Hac Vice granted, signed and filed 05/25/2023.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice held on 05/25/2023 09:00 AM .

Order

Order on Verified Application of Jade W. Sobh for Admission Pro Hac Vice signed and filed 05/23/2023.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice held on 05/23/2023 09:00 AM .

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Luma S. Al-Shibib

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jade W. Sobh

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Bridget B. Hirsch in Support of Verified Application of Luma S. Al-Shibib for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 08/09/2023 08:30 AM .

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Notice of Hearing on Application of Steven P. Nassi to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Jonathan Gross in Support of Motion and Verified Application for an Order Admitting Steven P. Nassi to the Bar of this Court Pro Hac Vice (Rule 9.40) filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Motion

Notice of Hearing on Application and Verified Application for Admission of Steven P. Nassi to the Bar of This Court Pro Hac Vice filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Notice of Hearing on Application of Jeffrey S. Weinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Declaration in Support

Declaration of Jonathan Gross in Support of Motion for an Order Admitting Jeffrey S. Weinstein to the Bar of this Court Pro Hac Vice (Rule 9.40) filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Motion

Notice of Hearing on Application and Verified Application for Admission of Jeffrey S. Weinstein to the Bar of This Court Pro Hac Vice filed by Safety Specialty Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; Zurich American Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; United Specialty Insurance Company; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Everest Indemnity Insurance Company.

Stipulation and Order

Stipulation and Protective Order signed by Judge Lee on 08/09/2023 entered and filed.

Stipulation

Stipulated ESI Protocol filed by Everest Indemnity Insurance Company; Steadfast Insurance Company; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541; Old Republic Union Insurance Company; Westport Insurance Corporation; General Security Indemnity Company; HDI Global Specialty SE; QBE Specialty Insurance Company; Indian Harbor Insurance Company; United Specialty Insurance Company; Lexington Insurance Company; Zurich American Insurance Company; Safety Specialty Insurance Company.

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541 (Defendant); Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant); General Security Indemnity Company (Defendant); HDI Global Specialty SE (Defendant); Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Defendant); Lexington Insurance Company (Defendant); Old Republic Union Insurance Company (Defendant); QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Safety Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Steadfast Insurance Company (Defendant); United Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Westport Insurance Corporation (Defendant); Zurich American Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Court Room: 10C; Judge: Jayne Lee; Participants; Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London subscribing to Policy Number AMR-71541 (Defendant); Everest Indemnity Insurance Company (Defendant); General Security Indemnity Company (Defendant); HDI Global Specialty SE (Defendant); Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Defendant); Lexington Insurance Company (Defendant); Old Republic Union Insurance Company (Defendant); QBE Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Safety Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Steadfast Insurance Company (Defendant); United Specialty Insurance Company (Defendant); Westport Insurance Corporation (Defendant); Zurich American Insurance Company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 12/11/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 12/11/2023 at 8:00 AM before Hon. Jayne Lee in Department 10C.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10C; Result: Held; Judge: Jayne Lee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Result: Vacated; Judge: Robert T. Waters

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation and Protective Order signed by Judge Lee on 08/09/2023 entered and filed.; Judge: Lee, Jayne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Westport Insurance Company in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 817880.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Melissa A Dubbs, retained for Westport Insurance Company .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 08/09/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Bridget Byrnes Hirsch, retained for Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC .; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Diamond Foods Holdings, LLC.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketPayment received by LLC Diamond Foods Holdings in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 810789.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Waters, Robert T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less