This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 04/05/2023 at 11:02:19 (UTC).

Devantae Aguirrie vs Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/19/2023 Devantae Aguirrie filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc , a Washington Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************0378

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aguirrie, Devantae

Defendant

Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aiwazian, Edwin

Defendant Attorney

Hansen, Esq., Drew R.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Aguirrie, Devantae.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aguirrie, Devantae.

Answer

Defendant Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation.

Notice

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10D; Result: Vacated; Judge: Barbara Kronlund; Participants; Devantae Aguirrie (Plaintiff); Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • DocketCase status updated to Removed to Federal Court.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Drew R. Hansen, Esq., retained for Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketComplex Case Fee (Per Defendant) filed by Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc.'s Answer to Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint and Affirmative Defenses filed by Oak Harbor Freight Lines, Inc., a Washington Corporation.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Inc., Oak Harbor Freight Lines in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 819630.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 07/18/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketComplex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Aguirrie, Devantae.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Aguirrie, Devantae.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Aguirrie, Devantae.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Devantae Aguirrie in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 804755.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Devantae Aguirrie in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 804755.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketAttorney, Edwin Aiwazian, retained for Devantae Aguirrie .; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less