This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 12/12/2021 at 15:28:42 (UTC).

Department Stores National Bank vs Kristie N Parises

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Department Stores National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kristie N Parises. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Lodi Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alva, Jose L.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************2067

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Alva, Jose L.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Department Stores National Bank

Defendant

Parises, Kristie N

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bradish, Maria

Defendant Attorney

Chavez-Ochoa, Brian R

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

NoticeofCaseAssignment-WithoutHearing.rtf

Notice of Case Assignment. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Jose L. Alva in Department L2. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Jose L. Alva in Department L2. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

General Denial

First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Parises, Kristie N. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

POS040 Proof of Service

Proof of Service of Summons as to Kristie N Parises served on 10/07/2018 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

CIV110 Request for Dismissal with Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Closed. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: L2; Result: Vacated; Judge: Jose L. Alva; Participant: Department Stores National Bank (Plaintiff); Participant: Kristie N Parises (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCase status updated to Disposed. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Department Stores National Bank, Kristie N Parises Entered. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketHearing Result: Vacated Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Brian R Chavez-Ochoa, retained for Kristie N Parises . Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/10/2019 at 10:30 AM before Hon. Jose L. Alva in Department L2. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000) filed by Parises, Kristie N. Action Type: First paper Limited Civil (amounts up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Kristie Parises in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 353651. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Kristie N Parises served on 10/07/2018 by Personal Service. $65.00. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Limited (amount up to $10,000) filed by Department Stores National Bank. Action Type: Complaint Limited (amount up to $10,000); Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Department Stores National Bank in the amount of $225.00. Receipt number 339827. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketAttorney, Maria Bradish, retained for Department Stores National Bank . Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Alva, Jose L..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chavez-Ochoa, Brian R