This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 07/17/2018 at 19:23:32 (UTC).

Department Of Fair Employment & Housing vs Amazon and/or Golden State FC, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/15/2017 Department Of Fair Employment Housing filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Amazon and/or Golden State FC, LLC. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kronlund, Barbara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************4878

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kronlund, Barbara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Department Of Fair Employment & Housing

Defendant

Amazon and/or Golden State FC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Balderrama, Francisco V

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/13/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

CM200 Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Notice of Hearing

02/06/2018: Notice of Hearing

CIV110 Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Department Of Fair Employment & Housing, Amazon and/or Golden State FC, LLC Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

Declaration

Declaration of Service of Dismissal filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Case status updated to Disposed. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal - Entire Action as to Department Of Fair Employment & Housing, Amazon and/or Golden State FC, LLC Entered. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Request for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Request for Dismissal; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Service of Dismissal filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Request for Dismissal , set for 06/01/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • Hearing Result: Vacated Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Settlement - Conditional filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Notice of Settlement - Conditional; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Hearing regarding: CMC: Further Case Management Conference , set for 03/20/2018 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on November 13, 2017. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 11/13/2017 08:45 AM . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case Management Statement filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/13/2017 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Barbara Kronlund in Department 10D. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Attorney, Francisco V Balderrama, retained for Department Of Fair Employment & Housing . Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Department Of Fair Employment & Housing. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • Case initiated. Judge: Kronlund, Barbara.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMAZON INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF FAIR EMPLOYMENT AND HOUSING is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Balderrama, Francisco V