Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/03/2018 at 03:10:03 (UTC).

Denzle Thompson vs. Nathaniel Romero

Case Summary

On 08/23/2011 Denzle Thompson filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against Nathaniel Romero. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Tracy Branch Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********************1878

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tracy Branch Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thompson, Denzle

Thompson, Muriel

Defendants

Romero, Nathaniel

Romero, Rebecca

 

Court Documents

Payment Receipt

01/17/2012: Payment Receipt

Notice of Hearing

09/22/2011: Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

09/20/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

09/14/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order

09/07/2011: Order

CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

08/23/2011: CM010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

UD100 Complait

08/23/2011: UD100 Complait

Payment Receipt

08/23/2011: Payment Receipt

Notice that you have been sued

08/23/2011: Notice that you have been sued

EJ001 Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

01/17/2012: EJ001 Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Minute Order

10/04/2011: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

09/22/2011: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Notice of Hearing

09/20/2011: Notice of Hearing

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

09/14/2011: FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

09/13/2011: UD150 Request/Counter-Request to Set Case

POS040 Proof of Service

09/13/2011: POS040 Proof of Service

Payment Receipt

09/06/2011: Payment Receipt

SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

08/23/2011: SUM130 Summons - Unlawful Detainer

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2012
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other to Offsite,Records Management,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Payment received for 141A - Abstract of judgment - Civil in the amount of 25.00 on 01/17/2012, transaction number 923814 and receipt number 246367. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2012
  • Abstract issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • location changed from Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Unlawful Detainers to Courthouse,Courthouse - Sections,Other Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2011
  • Payment received for 44A - Copy of any record (per side), 141J - Certifying a copy, paper or record in the amount of 26.00 on 11/15/2011, transaction number 894779 and receipt number 238570. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 45 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2011
  • Milestone of Disposition 30 days met late. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Automatic Cases Awaiting Final Judgment Papers Clock stopped. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2011
  • Complaint associated on 11/04/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
76 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2011
  • Case initiation completed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Case initiation form printed. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Automatic UD Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Automatic Failure to File Default Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Automatic Proof of Service Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Summons issued. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Case assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Original Summons filed by Thompson, Denzle; Thompson, Muriel on 08/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Thompson, Denzle; Thompson, Muriel on 08/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2011
  • Complaint filed by Thompson, Denzle; Thompson, Muriel on 08/23/2011. Judge: CONVERSION.

    Read MoreRead Less