This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/01/2023 at 15:01:03 (UTC).

Denny Rowles vs Brian Holland et al.

Case Summary

On 08/16/2022 Denny Rowles filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Brian Holland. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************7170

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rowles, Denny

Defendants

Canus Corporation

Holland, Brian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Guenard, Glenn

Defendant Attorney

Stinnett, Jennifer K.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.

Complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rowles, Denny.

cm-010 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rowles, Denny.

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed.

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint filed by Rowles, Denny.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Brian Holland served on 10/10/2022 by Substituted Service. $134.00.

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Canus Corporation served on 09/14/2022 by Substituted Service. $69.00.

Answer

Defendant Canus Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Canus Corporation.

Answer

Defendant Brian Holland's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Holland, Brian.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Rowles, Denny.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Canus Corporation.

Minute_Order.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/14/2023 08:45 AM .

Notice of Hearing

Hearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 08/23/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Brian Holland (Defendant); Canus Corporation (Defendant); Denny Rowles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Trial Setting Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Continued-Court's Motion; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Brian Holland (Defendant); Canus Corporation (Defendant); Denny Rowles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 08/23/2023 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled on 08/16/2023 at 8:45 AM has been Continued.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Result: Held; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participants; Brian Holland (Defendant); Denny Rowles (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketHearing regarding: Trial Setting Conference , set for 08/16/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/14/2023 08:45 AM .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketHearing re: Case Management Conference held on February 14, 2023.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Rowles, Denny.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketPayment received by Canus Corporation in the amount of $150.00. Receipt number 807508.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to Brian Holland served on 10/10/2022 by Substituted Service. $134.00.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint filed by Rowles, Denny.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 02/14/2023 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Erin Guy Castillo in Department 10B.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Rowles, Denny.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Rowles, Denny.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketPayment received by Denny Rowles in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 763713.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketAttorney, Glenn Guenard, retained for Denny Rowles .; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketCase initiated.; Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less