This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 10/12/2021 at 09:46:30 (UTC).

Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated vs J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against J R Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Waters, Robert T.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************4841

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Waters, Robert T.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated

Defendant

J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lucio, Christina M.

Defendant Attorney

Nader, Michael J

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice of Entry of Order

Notice of Entry of Order filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Order After Hearing

Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Accept Documents as Timely Filed filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Demurrer, Motion held on 09/28/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

TentativeRuling/ProbateNote.rtf

Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Proof of Service

Proof of service filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Request for Judicial Notice

Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Reply to Opposition to Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act, or in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Response

Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of Michael J. Nader in Support of Defendant's Demurrer and Motion filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Response; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Reply to Opposition

Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's Reply to Opposition to Demurrer and Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Reply; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Motion

Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Accept Documents as Timely Filed filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Objection

Plaintiff's Objection to Declaration of Michael J. Nader in Support of Defendant's Demurrer and Motion filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Objection; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer or Motion to Stay filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Opposition

Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's PAGA Complaint filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Notice to Filing Party

09/15/2021: Notice to Filing Party

Amended Notice of Demurrer

Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's Amended Notice of Demurrer and Demurer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Amended; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for Enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Declaration

Declaration of Michael J. Nader in Support of Defendant's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Complaint for enforcement Under the Private Attorneys General Act or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant J.R. Simplot Company's Demurrer to Plaintiff's Paga Complaint, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Stay filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • HearingHearing Type: Status Hearing; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff); Participant: J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 11B; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff); Participant: J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Order filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Action Type: Notice of Entry of Order; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Motion; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated (Plaintiff); Participant: J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Demurrer; Court Room: 11B; Result: Held; Judge: Robert T. Waters; Participant: J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Accept Documents as Timely Filed filed by J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Status Hearing re Federal stay update, set for 03/23/2022 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Demurrer, Motion held on 09/28/2021 09:00 AM . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketHearing re: Motion held on September 28, 2021. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons as to J.R. Simplot Company, a Nevada Corporation served on 06/16/2021 by Personal Service. $246.38. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 11/22/2021 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Robert T. Waters in Department 11B. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketComplex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs) filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Complex Case Fee (One fee for all Plaintffs); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPayment received by on Dennis Tony Dutra in the amount of $1435.00. Receipt number 648545. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Christina M. Lucio, retained for Dennis Tony Dutra, on behalf of himself and all others similarly situated . Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Waters, Robert T..

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where J.R. Simplot Foundation, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LUCIO, CHRISTINA M.