This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/07/2018 at 02:29:59 (UTC).

Dennis Servaes vs. Mani Investment

Case Summary

On 06/03/2010 Dennis Servaes filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Mani Investment. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sparks, Sheryle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******************9218

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Sparks, Sheryle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Servaes, Dennis

Defendant

Mani Investment

Not Classified By Court

Mani, Subar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Stark, Terry D.

 

Court Documents

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities For Removal of Lien From Real Property of the Defendant filed by Mani, Subar. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Minute Order

07/23/2010: Minute Order

Minute Order

11/16/2010: Minute Order

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion held on 05/17/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

Notice of Motion

Defendant's Notice of Motion for Relief From Lien on Personal Property filed by Mani, Subar. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

DEFTS Motion for relief from lien on Personal Residence ej

DEFTS Motion or other paper requesting a hearing filed by Mani, Subar; Mani Investment. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

09/29/2010: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

Minute Order

11/16/2010: Minute Order

Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

08/14/2012: Notice of Hearing San Joaquin

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketHearing re: Motion held on May 17, 2018. Judge: Soldati, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion held on 05/17/2018 01:30 PM . Judge: Holland, Lesley D..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities For Removal of Lien From Real Property of the Defendant filed by Mani, Subar. Action Type: Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Subar Mani filed by Mani, Subar. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDefendant's Notice of Motion for Relief From Lien on Personal Property filed by Mani, Subar. Action Type: Motion or other paper requesting a hearing; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketPayment received by Subar Mani in the amount of $60.00. Receipt number 280070. Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketHearing regarding: Motion , set for 05/17/2018 at 1:30 PM before Hon. John Soldati in Department 3B. Judge: Soldati, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney filed by Servaes, Dennis. Action Type: Substitution of Attorney; Judge: Sparks, Sheryle.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • DocketHearing re: Motion held on March 3, 2017. Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion held on 03/03/2017 09:00 AM . Judge: Lofthus, Linda L..

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Fee Waiver Application Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAutomatic Small Claims Disposition Clock started. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketCase has been initiated. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketVolume 1 created and added to case file with an ROA Start Date of 06/03/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAddress for Mani Investment selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketAddress for Dennis Servaes selected. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketCourt Trial (SC) - Principal 7500.00 Costs, 75.00 (fee waiver) scheduled for 07/19/2010 at 09:30:00 AM in T1 at Tracy. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketCase assigned to Department T1. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketApplication for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs filed by Servaes, Dennis on 06/03/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2010
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Servaes, Dennis on 06/03/2010. Judge: CONVERSION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stark, Terry D