Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 02:47:17 (UTC).

Dennis Manalo vs Casey Garcia

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 Dennis Manalo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Casey Garcia. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly, Carter and Guy Castillo, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************3134

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judges

Holly, Carter

Guy Castillo, Erin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Manalo, Dennis

Defendant

Garcia, Casey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ugorji, Chinonye U.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EGC)

05/03/2021: Notice of Reassignment of Judicial Officer (EGC)

SUM100 Summons - Civil

Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

FW003 Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Dennis Manalo. Judge: Holly, Carter.

civil case cover sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Manalo, Dennis. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

complaint

Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Manalo, Dennis. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

Notice of Case Assignment / Scheduling Information

Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingHearing Type: Case Management Conference; Court Room: 10B; Judge: Erin Guy Castillo; Participant: Casey Garcia (Defendant); Participant: Dennis Manalo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketErin Guy Castillo Assigned. BATCH Judge: Guy Castillo, Erin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketHearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/07/2021 at 8:45 AM before Hon. Carter Holly in Department 10B. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs - Granted as to Dennis Manalo. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Manalo, Dennis. Action Type: Request to Waive Court Fees; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Manalo, Dennis. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000) filed by Manalo, Dennis. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketAttorney, Chinonye U. Ugorji, retained for Dennis Manalo . Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketCase initiated. Judge: Holly, Carter.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer UGORJI CHINONYE U.