Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Joaquin County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:08:49 (UTC).

Delayne R Oliva et al. vs Cynthia Cotter et al.

Case Summary

On 11/17/2016 Delayne R Oliva filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Cynthia Cotter. This case was filed in San Joaquin County Superior Courts, Stockton Courthouse located in San Joaquin, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ross, Roger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******************1729

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    San Joaquin County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stockton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Joaquin, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ross, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Delayne R. Oliva and Berny Perez,

Perez, Berny

Oliva, Delayne R

Defendants

Cotter, Cynthia

Nationstar Mortgage,LLC,all persons unknown claiming any legal or equitable right,title,estate,lien,or interest in the property described in the complaint

All Persons Unknown Claiming Any Legal or Equitable Right,Title,Estate,Lien,or Interest in the Property Described in the Complaint

Nationstar Mortgage,LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Day, Connor M

Defendant Attorneys

Richman, Ronald L.

Givental, Alisa A.

Hall, Howard Dorsey

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of service re: Opposition filed by Oliva, Delayne R; Perez, Berny. Action Type: Proof of Service; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Opposition

Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC filed by Perez, Berny; Oliva, Delayne R. Action Type: Opposition; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order

Order Granting Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Verified First Amended Complaint with 20 Days Leave to Amend filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Motion for Sanctions held on 05/03/2019 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC for Sanctions against Plaintiffs Delayne R. Oliva and Berny Perez and Buchman Provine Brothers Smith LLP Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure Section 128.7 filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial NoticeNationstar Mortgage LLC for Judgment of the pleadings as to PLTF Verified First Amended Complaint; Memorandum of Point and Authorities in support thereof filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Request for Judicial Notice; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Notice to Filing Party

02/25/2019: Notice to Filing Party

POS010 Proof of Service of Summons

Proof of Service of Summons as to Cynthia Cotter served on 10/02/2017 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 05/22/2017 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Cotter, Cynthia. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

Answer

Verified Answer of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC to Plaintiff's Verified First Amended Complaint for Quiet Title and Declaratory Relief filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Answer; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Oliva, Delayne R; Perez, Berny. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

CM110 Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Oliva, Delayne R; Perez, Berny. Action Type: Case Management Statement; Judge: Ross, Roger.

MinuteOrder.rtf

Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference held on 02/06/2018 08:30 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

Order Granting

Order Granting Application for Service by Publication filed by Delayne R Oliva, Berny Perez. Judge: Ross, Roger.

Declaration

Declaration Re: Application for Service by Publication filed by Delayne R. Oliva and Berny Perez,. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

85 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Third Amended Complaint filed by Oliva, Delayne R; Perez, Berny. Action Type: Amended Complaint; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Granting Motion for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of William E. Alsnauer, Jr., Re: Service of [Proposed] Order Granting Motion of Defendant Nationstar Mortgage LLC for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Verified Second Amended Complaint with Leave to Amend Pursuant to California Rule of Court 3.1312 filed by Nationstar Mortgage,LLC. Action Type: Declaration; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Appointing Official Reporter Pro Tempore filed. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, Further Case Management Conference, Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on 06/27/2019 09:00 AM . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 10/17/2019 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 11B. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing re: Further Case Management Conference held on June 27, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing re: Court's OSC Re: Dismissal held on June 27, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Hearing re: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings held on June 27, 2019. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Tentative Ruling published. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
117 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2017
  • Hearing re: Case Management Conference held on May 22, 2017. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons as to Nationstar Mortgage,LLC, served on 01/06/2017 by Notice of Acknowledgement of Receipt. $0.00. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Hearing regarding: Case Management Conference , set for 05/22/2017 at 8:30 AM before Hon. Roger Ross in Department 13. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Notice of Case Assignment and Scheduling Information. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Case initiated. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Attorney, Connor M Day, retained for Delayne R. Oliva and Berny Perez . Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued and filed. Action Type: Summons - Civil; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Verified Complaint for Quiet Title and Declaration Relief filed by Oliva, Delayne R. Action Type: Complaint Unlimited Civil (over $25,000); Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Oliva, Delayne R. Action Type: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • Payment received by Delayne Oliva in the amount of $435.00. Receipt number 120834. Judge: Ross, Roger.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GIVENTAL ALISA A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richman, Ronald Lee

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALL HOWARD DORSEY